blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4339121

EP4339121 - CONSUMER PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.04.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.02.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 22.05.2024  [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter and Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2024/12]
Inventor(s)01 / DEPOOT, Karel Jozef Maria
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
02 / HOEFTE, Paulus Antonius Augustinus
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
03 / KEULEERS, Robby Renilde Francois
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
04 / Labeque, Regine
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
 [2024/12]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Belgium UK
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[2024/12]
Application number, filing date22195494.414.09.2022
[2024/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4339121
Date:20.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2023
ClassificationIPC:B65D5/56, B65D65/46
[2024/12]
CPC:
B65D5/563 (EP); B65D65/46 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBRAUCHERPRODUKT[2024/12]
English:CONSUMER PRODUCT[2024/12]
French:PRODUIT DE CONSOMMATION[2024/12]
Examination procedure11.04.2024Application withdrawn by applicant  [2024/21]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]CA3081510  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * page 18, line 3 ** page 21, line 1 *;
 [XY]US2022089342  (ASHTON ROSS DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0028] , [0068] , [0069] , [0079] , [0083] , [0086] , [0087] , [0185] , [0186] * [Y] 3,4
by applicantGB751600
 US3341466
 US3516941
 US3577515
 EP0385534
 US5066419
 US5154842
 US6020066
 US6544926
 US2003125222
 US6592990
 WO03101606
 US6869923
 WO2018069413
 EP20190219568
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.