EP4160630 - PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD PROVIDED WITH AN INTEGRATED INDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERRARI S.p.A. Via Emilia Est, 1163 41100 Modena / IT | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LO CALZO, Giovanni 41100 MODENA / IT | 02 /
CASOLI, Luca 41100 MODENA / IT | 03 /
SITTA, Ugo 41100 MODENA / IT | 04 /
AGNELLO, Giuseppe 41100 MODENA / IT | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22196869.6 | 21.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | IT20210024580 | 24.09.2021 Original published format: IT202100024580 | [2023/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160630 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01F17/06, H01F27/28, H01F27/30, H01F27/32 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01F17/062 (EP);
H01F27/2895 (EP);
H01F27/306 (EP);
H01F27/324 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE MIT INTEGRIERTER INDUKTORVORRICHTUNG | [2023/14] | English: | PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD PROVIDED WITH AN INTEGRATED INDUCTOR DEVICE | [2023/14] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF INDUCTEUR INTÉGRÉ | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 02.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4639707 (TANAKA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 2-6,8 * figure 3 *; | [A]US4975672 (MCLYMAN COLONEL W T [US]) [A] 2-4 * abstract *; | [XI]JPH03133109 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP1071103 (MAGNETEK SPA [IT]) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraph [0034]; figures 15,18,19,20,28-30 * [I] 6-9,11-15; | [A]US2003127244 (CHO ALBERT [TW]) [A] 7* figure 6 *; | [A]EP2061043 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [A] 2-5,11 * paragraph [0019] *; | [XI]US2010253459 (ZIMMERMAN ALAN W [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-15; | [XI]CN202178142U (SHENZHEN MEGMEET ELECTRICAL CO) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-15; | [A]EP2711941 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [A] 2-5,11 * paragraph [0012]; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE102016210746 (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-15 | by applicant | JPH03133109 | EP1071103 | US2010253459 | CN202178142U | DE102016210746 |