EP4371681 - SETTING DEVICE FOR A BLIND RIVET NUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bollhoff Otalu S.A.S. Z.I. de l'Albanne Rue Armichède 73490 La Ravoire / FR | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTLER, Claude 73000 Berberaz / FR | 02 /
CUAZ, Bertrand 73000 Chambery / FR | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | HWP Intellectual Property Ridlerstraße 35 80339 München / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22306688.7 | 17.11.2022 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371681 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/04, B21J15/10, B21J15/12, B21J15/20, B21J15/24, B21J15/26, B21J15/28, B25B27/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B21J15/043 (EP);
B21J15/105 (EP);
B21J15/12 (EP);
B21J15/20 (EP);
B21J15/24 (EP);
B21J15/26 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SETZVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE BLINDNIETMUTTER | [2024/21] | English: | SETTING DEVICE FOR A BLIND RIVET NUT | [2024/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSE POUR ÉCROU À RIVET AVEUGLE | [2024/21] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 06.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4074554 (SUMMERLIN FREDERICK ARTHUR); | [XAY]US4574612 (TANIKAWA OSAMU [JP]); | [Y]EP0323113 (EMHART INC [US]); | [Y]US6851167 (HARLOW GARY [US], et al); | [Y]EP2093024 (OBER S P A [IT]) | by applicant | DE1945820 | DE4406946 | US5605070 | EP2093024 | EP2093024 | EP3144079 | EP3144079 |