EP4309322 - METHODS OF ENHANCING TRIGGERING FLEXIBILITY OF APERIODIC SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUPASINGHE, Nadisanka Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki Tokyo, 100--6150 / JP | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22714679.2 | 15.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022US20343 | Priority number, date | US202163161633P | 16.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163161633 P | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022197676 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4309322 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER AUSLÖSEFLEXIBILITÄT EINES APERIODISCHEN SOUNDING-REFERENZSIGNALS | [2024/04] | English: | METHODS OF ENHANCING TRIGGERING FLEXIBILITY OF APERIODIC SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNAL | [2024/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA FLEXIBILITÉ DE DÉCLENCHEMENT D'UN SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE SONDAGE APÉRIODIQUE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016192356 (LEE SEUNGMIN [KR], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0226] *; | [X]US2018014301 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0119] * | by applicant | - "NR; Physical procedure for data (Release 16", 3GPP TS 38.214 | - "NR; Multiplexing and channel coding (Release 16", 3GPP TS 38.212 | - "NR; Radio Resource Control; Protocol specification (Release 15", 3GPP TS 38.331 |