blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4313832

EP4313832 - ROLLER GUIDE SHOE FOR GUIDING AN ELEVATOR CAB OR A COUNTERWEIGHT OF AN ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.10.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / BUMANN, Patrick
6274 Eschenbach LU / CH
02 / ZAPF, Volker
6012 Kriens-Obernau / CH
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Inventio AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22715061.216.03.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022EP56768
Priority number, dateEP2021016596730.03.2021         Original published format: EP 21165967
[2024/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022207314
Date:06.10.2022
Language:DE
[2022/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4313832
Date:07.02.2024
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:B66B7/04
[2024/06]
CPC:
B66B7/048 (EP); B66B7/046 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
TitleGerman:ROLLENFÜHRUNGSSCHUH ZUM FÜHREN EINER AUFZUGSKABINE ODER EINES GEGENGEWICHTS EINES AUFZUGS[2024/06]
English:ROLLER GUIDE SHOE FOR GUIDING AN ELEVATOR CAB OR A COUNTERWEIGHT OF AN ELEVATOR[2024/06]
French:PATIN À GALETS DE GUIDAGE DESTINÉ AU GUIDAGE D'UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR OU D'UN CONTREPOIDS D'ASCENSEUR[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2023National basic fee paid 
30.08.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
30.08.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS5147739  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [XAI]WO2013170532  (HANGZHOU HUNING ELEVATOR ACCESSORIES CO LTD [CN], et al);
 [XA]US2020317472  (LAUGHTON ANDREW JAMES [US], et al)
by applicantUS5107963
 US7562749
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.