EP4330329 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THERMOPLASTIC ABS MOLDING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Styrolution Group GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 50 60325 Frankfurt / DE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIESSNER, Norbert 67159 Friedelsheim / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Wolfgang 69124 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
BANASZAK, Brian J. 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 04 /
HONEKER, Roman 50737 Köln / DE | 05 /
MICHELS, Gisbert 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 06 /
VERSTRAETEN, Rudy 2340 Beerse / BE | 07 /
CHUNG, Jinhwa Andrew Plainfield, Illinois 60585 / US | 08 /
HWANG, YoungHwa Ulju-gun, Ulsan 44932 / KR | 09 /
AHN, SangJun Seoul 05658 / KR | 10 /
TAELMAN, Koen 2930 Brasschaat / BE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Kudla, Karsten Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22726098.1 | 28.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022EP61367 | Priority number, date | EP20210171710 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21171710 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022229335 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4330329 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08L25/12, C08F6/18, C08F279/04, C08J3/00, C08J3/20, C08C1/15, C08F212/10, C08F236/10, B29B7/84, B29C48/76 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
C08F212/10 (EP);
B29C48/766 (KR);
B29B7/007 (EP,KR);
B29B7/48 (EP,KR);
B29B7/72 (EP);
B29B7/726 (KR);
B29B7/7495 (KR);
B29B7/826 (KR);
B29B7/845 (EP,KR);
B29B7/86 (EP,KR);
B29B7/90 (EP,KR);
B29C48/0022 (KR);
B29C48/03 (EP,KR);
B29C48/761 (EP,KR);
B29C48/83 (KR);
B29C48/873 (KR);
C08C1/15 (EP);
C08F279/04 (EP,KR);
C08F6/005 (EP);
C08F6/18 (EP);
C08J3/203 (KR);
C08J3/215 (EP,KR);
C08L25/12 (EP,KR);
C08L55/02 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F6/005, C08L25/12 (EP);
C08F6/005, C08L55/02 (EP);
C08F6/18, C08L25/12 (EP);
C08F6/18, C08L55/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON THERMOPLASTISCHEN ABS-FORMMASSEN | [2024/10] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THERMOPLASTIC ABS MOLDING COMPOSITIONS | [2024/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES COMPOSITIONS DE MOULAGE THERMOPLASTIQUES ABS | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 28.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04311704 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]EP0735077 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2017093468 (INEOS STYROLUTION GROUP GMBH [DE]) [X] 20,21 * example - * * claim - * * page 39; table - * | by applicant | DE1495730 | DE1300266 | DE2037784 | DE2427960 | EP0062901 | JPS5927776 | JPS6153362 | EP0258741 | US5151026 | EP0534235 | US5232649 | US5817266 | US6165399 | DE102005022632 | WO2014170406 | WO2015000873 | WO2015165810 | - W. SCHOLTANH. LANGE, Kolloid Z. u. Z. Polymere, (19720000), vol. 250, pages 782 - 796 | - "Dispersionen und Emulsionen: Eine Einfuhrung", G. LAGALYO. SCHULZR. ZIEMEHL, Kolloidik feinverteilter Stoffe einschlie&lich der Tonminerale, Steinkopf-Verlag, (19970000), page 282 | - Pfropfcopolymer B, Allgemeine Vorgehensweise, pages 34 - 35 | - Kunststoff-Handbuch, Carl Hanser Verlag, (19730000), vol. VIII, page 695 | - CAS, no. 68610-51-5 | - "Methoden der Organischen Chemie", HOU-BEN-WEYL, Makromolekulare Stoffe, Thieme Verlag, (19610000), page 307 |