blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4313278

EP4313278 - STIMULATION SYSTEMS WITH USER-SPECIFIED ROUTINES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.07.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2024Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation
25155 Rye Canyon Loop
Valencia, CA 91355 / US
[2024/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HUYNH, Dat, Thanh
Hollywood, CA 90046 / US
02 / MCDONALD, Matthew, Lee
Glendale, CA 91208 / US
 [2024/06]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2024/06]
Application number, filing date22740646.906.06.2022
[2024/06]
WO2022US32349
Priority number, dateUS202163197747P07.06.2021         Original published format: US 202163197747 P
[2024/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022261001
Date:15.12.2022
Language:EN
[2022/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4313278
Date:07.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.12.2022
ClassificationIPC:A61N1/372, G16H40/40
[2024/06]
CPC:
A61N1/37247 (EP); A61N1/05 (US); A61B5/0022 (US);
A61B5/7435 (US); A61N1/3606 (US); A61N1/36135 (US);
A61N1/37282 (EP); G16H20/30 (EP); G16H40/40 (EP);
G16H40/67 (EP,US); G16H50/20 (EP); A61B2560/0219 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STIMULATIONSSYSTEME MIT BENUTZERSPEZIFIZIERTENROUTINEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2024/06]
English:STIMULATION SYSTEMS WITH USER-SPECIFIED ROUTINES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING[2024/06]
French:SYSTÈMES DE STIMULATION AYANT DES ROUTINES SPÉCIFIÉES PAR L'UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION[2024/06]
Entry into regional phase31.10.2023National basic fee paid 
31.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
31.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/06]
31.10.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]US6516227  (MEADOWS PAUL [US], et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [A]US2007260283  (LI DAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2016112398  (AXONICS MODULATION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2017197086  (HOWARD JOSHUA DALE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0063] - [0112] *
by applicantUS6181969
 US6295944
 US6391985
 US6516227
 US6609029
 US6609032
 US6741892
 US6895280
 US2007150036
 US7244150
 US7437193
 US7450997
 US2009187222
 US2009276021
 US7672734
 US2010076535
 US7761165
 US7783359
 US7792590
 US7809446
 US2010268298
 US2011004267
 US2011005069
 US2011078900
 US7949395
 US2011130817
 US2011130818
 US7974706
 US2011238129
 US2011313500
 US2012016378
 US2012046710
 US2012071949
 US8175710
 US2012165911
 US8224450
 US2012197375
 US2012203316
 US2012203320
 US2012203321
 US8271094
 US8295944
 US2012316615
 US8364278
 US8391985
 US2013105071
 US2013317572
 US2013317573
 US8688235
 US8831742
 US2017225007
 US2017259078
 US2018110971
 US2018369606
 US2018369607
 US2019209849
 US2019209834
 US2020094047
 US2020155854
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.