EP4281170 - ADAPTER TO FACILITATE BLOOD DRAW AND INFUSION, RELATED SYSTEMS, AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton Dickinson and Company One Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAACSON, S., Ray Layton, UT 84041 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22743051.9 | 19.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022US12852 | Priority number, date | US202163139621P | 20.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163139621 P | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022159412 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281170 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/22, A61M39/24, A61M1/36 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61M5/16813 (EP,KR,US);
A61M39/105 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/1408 (CN);
A61B5/15003 (EP,CN,KR);
A61B5/150221 (EP,KR);
A61B5/150267 (US);
A61B5/150992 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B5/153 (CN);
A61M25/0097 (KR,US);
A61M39/0247 (CN);
A61M39/10 (CN);
A61M5/1413 (EP,KR,US);
A61M5/142 (CN);
A61M2005/1403 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M2039/0018 (CN);
A61M2039/0202 (CN);
A61M2039/0205 (CN);
A61M2039/0258 (CN);
A61M2039/027 (CN);
A61M2039/1072 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2039/1077 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61M2210/12, A61M2210/005 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | ADAPTER ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DES BLUTZIEHENS UND DER INFUSION, ZUGEHÖRIGE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2023/48] | English: | ADAPTER TO FACILITATE BLOOD DRAW AND INFUSION, RELATED SYSTEMS, AND METHODS | [2023/48] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR FACILITER LE PRÉLÈVEMENT SANGUIN ET LA PERFUSION, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004102738 (DIKEMAN W CARY [US], et al) [A] 1-20* ; entire document. *; | [YA]US2010011888 (PAWLISZYN JANUSZ [CA], et al) [Y] 5-7, 17-20 * ; especially para [0063]-[0066], and Fig. 1 B. * [A] 8-13; | [XYA]US9737686 (TRAINER LAWRENCE J [US], et al) [X] 1, 14 * (22.00.2017); entire document, especially col 6 In 34-59, and Fig. 6. * [Y] 5-7, 17-20 [A] 2-4, 8-13, 15-16; | [A]US2019021640 (BURKHOLZ JONATHAN KARL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document. * |