EP4377149 - CONNECTING ASSEMBLY AND BABY SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wonderland Switzerland AG Beim Bahnhof 5 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zujian 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/23] | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22758497.6 | 29.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022EP71424 | Priority number, date | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 Original published format: CN202110872990 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006983 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377149 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
B60N2/2887 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG UND KINDERSITZ | [2024/23] | English: | CONNECTING ASSEMBLY AND BABY SEAT | [2024/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE LIAISON ET SIÈGE DE BÉBÉ | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 19.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008277984 (CARINE DAVID SHAUN [GB]); | [A]US2012267926 (NETT REINER [DE], et al); | [X]CN204978315U (MAX-INF (NINGBO) BABY PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [XAI]EP3670252 (BRITAX ROEMER KINDERSICHERHEIT GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2020269732 (BENDJELLAL FARID [FR], et al) |