EP4316108 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC MULTICARRIER ALLOCATION TO NB-IOT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jio Platforms Limited Office-101, Saffron, Nr. Centre Point Panchwati 5 Rasta Ambawadi Ahmedabad, Gujarat 380006 / IN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Ranjit Ma Jabalpur Madhya Pradesh 482002 / IN | 02 /
DHOLKE, Smith Kalyan West Maharashtra 421301 / IN | 03 /
PARAB, Ulhas D Mumbai Maharashtra 400708 / IN | 04 /
KADAM, Amol M Thane Maharashtra 421201 / IN | 05 /
GHADGE, Nikhil Thane (W) Maharashtra 400615 / IN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22774433.1 | 15.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022IB52316 | Priority number, date | IN202121013485 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: IN202121013485 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022200918 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4316108 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L27/26 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04L1/1635 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (CN,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (CN,US);
H04W24/10 (CN);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04W76/27 (CN);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04L5/0064 (EP);
H04L5/0071 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DYNAMISCHEN MEHRTRÄGERZUWEISUNG AN NB-IOT-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/06] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DYNAMIC MULTICARRIER ALLOCATION TO NB-IOT DEVICES | [2024/06] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTRIBUTION DYNAMIQUE DE PORTEUSES MULTIPLES À DES DISPOSITIFS NB-IOT | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2017133700 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]); | [Y]US2018063841 (SONG LEI [US], et al) |