EP4317274 - POLYPROPYLENE RESIN EXTRUDED FOAM PARTICLES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND FOAM MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Masaki Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Kiyotaka Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22775817.4 | 25.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP14285 | Priority number, date | JP20210052150 | 25.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021052150 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022203036 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317274 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/16 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP);
C08J9/16 (EP);
C08J9/232 (EP);
C08J2201/03 (EP);
C08J2203/06 (EP);
C08J2323/14 (EP);
C08J2423/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRUDIERTE POLYPROPYLENHARZSCHAUMSTOFFPARTIKEL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND SCHAUMSTOFFFORMKÖRPER | [2024/06] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE RESIN EXTRUDED FOAM PARTICLES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND FOAM MOLDED BODY | [2024/06] | French: | PARTICULES DE MOUSSE EXTRUDÉE DE RÉSINE DE POLYPROPYLÈNE, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET CORPS MOULÉ EN MOUSSE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2023 | Translation filed | 20.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2009256460 (KANEKA CORP) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1, 3, paragraphs [0015], [0016], examples *; | [Y]WO2016147919 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0107] *; | [A]WO2018016399 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2020004429 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JPS5122951 | JPS5333996 | JPH09302131 | JPH10237212 | JP2002542360 | JP2009144096 | JP2009256460 | JP2014055924 | WO2018016399 |