EP4317444 - RNA PLASMID DELIVERY SYSTEM AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing University LIU, Ying 163 Xianlin Avenue, Qixia District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Chenyu Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Xi Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 03 /
FU, Zheng Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 04 /
LI, Jing Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Xiang Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 06 /
ZHOU, Xinyan Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Li Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 08 /
YU, Mengchao Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | 09 /
GUO, Hongyuan Nanjing, Jiangsu 210023 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22778920.3 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN83598 | Priority number, date | CN202110335617 | 29.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110335617 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022206738 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317444 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/85, C12N15/113, A61K31/7105, A61P35/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C12N15/85 (EP,CN);
A61K31/7105 (EP);
A61K31/713 (EP,CN);
A61K47/64 (EP,CN);
A61K48/0016 (EP);
A61P1/00 (CN);
A61P11/00 (CN);
A61P21/04 (CN);
A61P25/14 (CN);
A61P25/16 (CN);
A61P25/28 (CN);
A61P3/04 (CN);
A61P3/10 (CN);
A61P35/00 (CN);
A61P37/06 (CN);
A61P9/00 (CN);
C12N15/113 (EP);
C12N15/1135 (CN);
C12N15/86 (CN);
C12N15/1138 (EP);
C12N2310/14 (EP,CN);
C12N2310/141 (EP,CN);
C12N2320/31 (EP);
C12N2320/32 (EP,CN);
C12N2750/14143 (CN);
C12N2800/107 (CN);
C12N2800/40 (EP);
C12N2810/50 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RNA-PLASMID-ABGABESYSTEM UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/06] | English: | RNA PLASMID DELIVERY SYSTEM AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2024/06] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION D'ARN PLASMIDIQUE ET SON APPLICATION | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2023 | Translation filed | 27.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN107034188 (HOSPITAL OF STOMATOLOGY SUN YAT-SEN UNIV) [A] 1-17 * see claims 1-10 *; | [A]CN108753827 (SHANGHAI SHENGBO BIOMEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * see claims 1-9 *; | [A]CN109966506 (2ND PEOPLES HOSPITAL SHENZHEN) [A] 1-17 * see claims 1-4 *; | [A]CN110227162 (TSINGHUA BERKELEY SHENZHEN INST PREPARATION OFFICE) [A] 1-17 * see claims 1-9 *; | [A]WO2020106771 (EXOSOME THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * see claims 1-20 *; | [A]CN111424052 (CHI BIOMEDICINE SHENZHEN TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * see entire document *; | [A]CN111979268 (SHANGHAI 10TH PEOPLES HOSPITAL) [A] 1-17 * see claims 1-10 *; | [PX]CN113444742 (LUBAOTE NANJING ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-5, 9-17 * see claims 1-9 *; | [A] - Zhou Jianfen, Chai Zhilan, Xie Cao, Lu Weiyue, "Research Progress of Exosomes Applied as Drug Carriers", Chinese Journal of Pharmaceuticals, (20200101), vol. 51, no. 4, doi:10.16522/j.cnki.cjph.2020.04.001, pages 425 - 433, XP055974995 [A] 1-17 * pp. 425-433, see entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.16522/j.cnki.cjph.2020.04.001 | [A] - Roberts Thomas C.; Langer Robert; Wood Matthew J. A., "Advances in oligonucleotide drug delivery", Nature Reviews Drug Discovery, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB , (20200811), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:10.1038/s41573-020-0075-7, ISSN 1474-1776, pages 673 - 694, XP037256878 [A] 1-17 * pp. 673-694, see entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41573-020-0075-7 | by applicant | CN106177990 | CN108096583 | CN108117585 | CN108250267 | CN108546702 | CN108624590 | CN108624591 | CN110699382 |