EP4319401 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUA, Meng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Fei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
PENG, Jinlin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Yi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Roth, Sebastian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22779081.3 | 31.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022CN84470 | Priority number, date | CN202110363928 | 02.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110363928 | [2024/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022206901 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4319401 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W72/12, H04L5/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W72/232 (US);
H04L27/26025 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W24/08 (CN);
H04W72/0446 (CN,KR);
H04W72/0457 (KR);
H04W72/1268 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DOWNLINK-STEUERINFORMATIONEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DOWNLINK CONTROL INFORMATION AND RELATED DEVICE | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2023 | Translation filed | 26.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN110830216 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-68 * entire document *; | [A]CN110958094 (RES INST CHINA MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS CORP, et al) [A] 1-68 * entire document *; | [A]WO2021021401 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-68* entire document *; | [PX] - Huawei, HiSilicon, "Discussion on SCell PDCCH scheduling P(S)Cell PDSCH or PUSCH", 3GPP Draft; R1-2102309, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20210407), vol. RAN WG1, no. E-meeting; 20210412 - 20210420, XP052177029 [PX] 1-28, 30, 32-60, 62, 64-68 * sections 2.1 and 3 * | [X] - ZTE, "Discussion on Cross-Carrier Scheduling from SCell to PCell", 3GPP Draft; R1-2100110, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20210119), vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20210125 - 20210205, XP051970815 [X] 27-28, 32, 59-60, 64-68 * section 2.3 * | [A] - Qualcomm Incorporated, "Views on cross-carrier scheduling from an SCell to the PCell/PSCell", 3GPP Draft; R1-2009277, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France , (20201024), vol. RAN WG1, no. E-meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, XP051946940 [A] 1-68 * entire document * |