EP4317919 - ABSOLUTE ENCODER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minebea Mitsumi Inc. 4106-73, Oaza Miyota, Miyota-machi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 3890293 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Katsunori Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0293 / JP | 02 /
SAKIEDA, Takeshi Kitasaku-gun, Nagano 389-0293 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Zabel, Julia Elisabeth Einsel Attorney at Law und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Große Bäckerstraße 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22779967.3 | 11.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP10842 | Priority number, date | JP20210062046 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021062046 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022209746 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317919 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G01D3/08 (EP);
G01D5/24433 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSOLUTER KODIERER | [2024/06] | English: | ABSOLUTE ENCODER | [2024/06] | French: | CODEUR ABSOLU | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2023 | Translation filed | 04.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010052663 (MEHNERT WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001]-[0048], [0054]-[0058], fig. 3 *; | [A]US2011080162 (STEINICH KLAUS MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2020203467 (MINEBEA MITSUMI INC [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0075]-[0118], [0201]-[0210], fig. 10-25, 41-42 * | by applicant | JP2013024572 |