blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4327071

EP4327071 - EROSION DETECTION AND PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baker Hughes Holdings LLC
17021 Aldine Westfield Road
Houston, TX 77073 / US
[2024/09]
Inventor(s)01 / MCCRACKIN, Sheldon
Houston, Texas 77073 / US
02 / DOMKAM, Carlneil
Houston, Texas 77073 / US
 [2024/09]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
Baker Hughes
245 Hammersmith
Chalk Hill Road
London W6 8DW / GB
[2024/09]
Application number, filing date22792685.419.04.2022
[2024/09]
WO2022US71798
Priority number, dateUS202163178509P22.04.2021         Original published format: US 202163178509 P
US20221771656508.04.2022         Original published format: US202217716565
[2024/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022226494
Date:27.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4327071
Date:28.02.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.10.2022
ClassificationIPC:G01N17/00, G01N21/88, G01N21/954, G06T7/00, G06T7/50, G06N20/00, G08B21/18
[2024/09]
CPC:
G06T7/0004 (EP); G01N21/954 (EP,US); G02B23/2423 (US);
G06T7/11 (EP); G06T7/136 (EP,US); G06V10/44 (EP);
G06V10/74 (EP); G01N2021/8887 (EP); G02B23/24 (EP);
G06T2207/10068 (EP); G06T2207/20081 (EP,US); G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30164 (EP); G06V2201/06 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EROSIONSERKENNUNG UND -VORHERSAGE[2024/09]
English:EROSION DETECTION AND PREDICTION[2024/09]
French:DÉTECTION ET PRÉDICTION D'ÉROSION[2024/09]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2023National basic fee paid 
30.10.2023Search fee paid 
30.10.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2023Examination requested  [2024/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5864601  (CATTORINI JOSEPH FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-10 and figures 1-2 *;
 [XY]US2003198374  (HAGENE JON KRISTIAN [NO], et al) [X] 1,5-6,10-11,15-16,20 * claims 1, 23 and figures 2, 3A * [Y] 2-4,7-9,12-14,17-19;
 [A]US2015226660  (AGNIHOTRAM GOPICHAND [IN], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0016]-[0039] and figures 2-3 *;
 [A]WO2020047469  (SAUDI ARABIAN OIL CO [SA], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0040]-[0060] and figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2021018426  (AMER AYMAN [SA], et al) [Y] 2-4,7-9,12-14,17-19 * paragraphs [0052]-[0073], claim 1 and figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.