EP4325753 - SIGNAL GENERATION METHOD, SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QU, Weilin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WU, Yiling Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Jun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
TANG, Yujian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
YAN, Mao Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Huawei European IPR Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22794579.7 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022CN86277 | Priority number, date | CN202110483718 | 30.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110483718 | [2024/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022228108 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4325753 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (CN);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP);
H04L1/08 (EP);
H04L25/491 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | SIGNALERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN, SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/08] | English: | SIGNAL GENERATION METHOD, SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD, AND RELATED DEVICE | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE SIGNAL, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL, ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | Translation filed | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6192068 (FATTOUCHE MICHEL T [CA], et al); | [A]CN101827050 (HARBIN INST OF TECH WEIHAI); | [A]CN102739322 (UNIV HARBIN ENG); | [A]CN103427917 (UNIV SHANGHAI SCIENCE & TECH); | [A]CN111865860 (HUNAN SHIKONG BENCHMARK TECH CO LTD) |