blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4359573

EP4359573 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF HOT BRIQUETTED IRON (HBI) CONTAINING FLUX AND/OR CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.03.2024
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.12.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2025Supplementary search reportpublished on 30.04.2025  [2025/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Midrex Technologies, Inc.
3735 Glen Lake Drive, Suite 400
Charlotte, North Carolina 28208 / US
[2024/18]
Inventor(s)01 / MICHISHITA, Haruyasu
Charlotte, NC 28277 / US
02 / HATAKEYAMA, Taiji
Charlotte, NC 28277 / US
03 / ASTORIA, Todd
Harrisburg, NC 28075 / US
 [2024/18]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2024/18]
Application number, filing date22829072.220.06.2022
[2024/18]
WO2022US34129
Priority number, dateUS202163213307P22.06.2021         Original published format: US 202163213307 P
US20221784301317.06.2022         Original published format: US202217843013
[2024/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022271576
Date:29.12.2022
Language:EN
[2022/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4359573
Date:01.05.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US29.12.2022
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2025
ClassificationIPC:C21B13/02, F27B1/00, C21B13/00, C22B1/243, C22B1/244
[2025/18]
CPC:
C21B13/0086 (EP,US); C22B1/24 (US); C21B13/008 (EP,US);
C21B13/02 (EP,US); C21B3/02 (US); C22B1/243 (EP,US);
C22B1/244 (EP,US); F27B1/00 (US); F27D13/00 (US);
F27D3/08 (US); Y02P10/134 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2024/18]C21B13/02, F27B1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/18]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HEISSEM BRIKETTIERTEM EISEN (HBI) MIT FLUSSMITTEL UND/ODER KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEM MATERIAL[2024/18]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF HOT BRIQUETTED IRON (HBI) CONTAINING FLUX AND/OR CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL[2024/18]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FER BRIQUETÉ À CHAUD (HBI) CONTENANT UN FONDANT ET/OU UNE MATIÈRE CARBONÉE[2024/18]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2023National basic fee paid 
21.12.2023Search fee paid 
21.12.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2023Examination requested  [2024/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US6074456  (FREYTAG JOCHEN [DE], et al);
 [XI]EP1290232  (MIDREX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]);
 [A]EP2132344  (MIDREX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]);
 [A]EP3760749  (JEIL MACHINERY CO LTD [KR])
International search[A]US2005151307  (VIRAMONTES-BROWN RICARDO [MX], et al);
 [A]US2010068088  (TANAKA HIDETOSHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2013081516  (SIMMONS JOHN J [US]);
 [A]US2020385827  (ASTORIA TODD MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [A]IN201921038999  (JSW STEEL LIMITED [IN])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.