EP4381436 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AND CURATING TASKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yohana LLC 3460 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Yoky Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
VISWANATHAN, Nitin Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 03 /
LIU, Lingyun Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 04 /
DEMING, Benjamin Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 05 /
PATERSON, Sean Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 06 /
VAN DER LINDEN, Gwendolyn W. Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 07 /
BEAULIEU, Malia Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22854103.3 | 04.08.2022 | [2024/24] | WO2022US74540 | Priority number, date | US202163229269P | 04.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163229269 P | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023015256 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4381436 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, H04N21/00 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q10/06316 (US);
G06F40/40 (US);
G06Q10/06311 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND KURARATION VON AUFGABEN | [2024/24] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AND CURATING TASKS | [2024/24] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION ET DE GESTION DE TÂCHES | [2024/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/24] | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2020210938 (MONOVICH AMIT [IL], et al); | [Y]US2020364305 (YATES TIMOTHY ALEXANDER [DE], et al); | [A]US2021092168 (RANALLI GINA [US], et al) |