EP4344140 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FRONTHAUL TRANSMISSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Hyoseung Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JEON, Namryul Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Keonwook Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KO, Jaeyun Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22878852.7 | 04.10.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022KR14910 | Priority number, date | KR20210131994 | 05.10.2021 Original published format: KR 20210131994 | [2024/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023059031 | Date: | 13.04.2023 | Language: | KO | [2023/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344140 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L27/36, H04W88/08, H04W92/20 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04W72/0446 (EP,US);
H04L12/46 (EP,KR);
H04L27/36 (EP,KR);
H04W88/08 (EP);
H04W88/085 (EP,KR);
H04W92/12 (EP);
H04W92/20 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FRONTHAUL-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2024/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR FRONTHAUL TRANSMISSION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION FRONTHAUL DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2023 | Translation filed | 22.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016255613 (FAERBER MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]KR102042036B ; | [Y]KR102067246B ; | [Y]KR20210043447 (ELECTRONICS & TELECOMMUNICATIONS RES INST [KR]); | [A]KR20210081980 (KT CORP [KR]) |