blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4255136

EP4255136 - BEZEL FOR A MULTI-SENSOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.04.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.09.2023
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider Electric Buildings Americas, Inc.
1650 West Crosby Road
Carrollton Texas 75006 / US
[2023/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Boretti, David John
Andover, MA 01810 / US
02 / Stojcevski, Goran
223 62 Lund / SE
03 / Veuillet, Pierre Francois
38500 Grenoble / FR
 [2023/40]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2023/40]
Application number, filing date23163408.022.03.2023
[2023/40]
Priority number, dateUS202263325237P30.03.2022         Original published format: US 202263325237 P
[2023/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4255136
Date:04.10.2023
Language:EN
[2023/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2023
ClassificationIPC:H05K5/06, G01D11/24
[2023/40]
CPC:
H05K5/061 (EP,CN); H05K5/0217 (CN); G01D11/245 (EP,CN,US);
G01D11/16 (CN); G01D11/26 (CN); G01D11/30 (US);
H05K5/0204 (CN); H05K5/03 (CN); H05K5/069 (EP,CN);
H05K7/1427 (CN) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/19]
Former [2023/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  ME,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BLENDE FÜR EINE MULTISENSORVORRICHTUNG[2023/40]
English:BEZEL FOR A MULTI-SENSOR DEVICE[2023/40]
French:LUNETTE POUR UN DISPOSITIF MULTI-CAPTEUR[2023/40]
Examination procedure04.04.2024Examination requested  [2024/19]
04.04.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.04.2024Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
15.05.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
15.05.2024Request for further processing filed
15.05.2024Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.05.2024Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP3032640  (ENEVO OY [FI]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] ** figure 2 *;
 [XAI]US2017082586  (WILLIAMSON ALASDAIR JAMES [GB]) [X] 1,2,11,15 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 3-4 * [A] 13,19,20 [I] 3-10,12,14,16-18;
 [IA]US2019120714  (PUSHECK JACOB [US]) [I] 1-12,14-18 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0020] * * figure 1 * [A] 13,19,20;
 [XAI]US10683677  (FUNAMURA JOSHUA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * column 14, line 3 - line 21 * * figures 5C-5E * [A] 13,15-20 [I] 3-7,9,10,12,14;
 [IA]US2021100533  (SERES MICHAEL [GB], et al) [I] 1-12,14-18 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0086] * * figures 3A-3C * [A] 13,19,20;
 [XAI]US2021168958  (CHOI JONGMUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,9-12,15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 16,19 [I] 2-8,13,14,17,18,20
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.