EP4236092 - DOWNLINK CONTROL FOR NON COHERENT JOINT TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Haitong Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 02 /
SEBENI, Johnson O. Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 03 /
JI, Zhu Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Dawei Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Wei Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 06 /
KIM, Yuchul Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 07 /
PU, Tianyan Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 08 /
ZHAO, Pengkai Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 09 /
ZENG, Wei Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 23163452.8 | 27.09.2019 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | US201862738616P | 28.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862738616 P | US201916579108 | 23.09.2019 Original published format: US201916579108 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4236092 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4236092 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/024, H04L5/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04B7/024 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (CN);
H04W88/06 (US);
H04B7/0413 (US);
H04L1/0028 (CN);
H04L5/0035 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN);
H04W72/1273 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | DOWNLINK-STEUERUNG FÜR NICHT KOHÄRENTE GEMEINSAME ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2023/35] | English: | DOWNLINK CONTROL FOR NON COHERENT JOINT TRANSMISSION | [2023/35] | French: | COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE POUR TRANSMISSION CONJOINTE NON COHÉRENTE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19200197.2 / EP3641146 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018127145 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [E]EP3557932 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |