Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4329066 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4329066



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 150
27.08.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.08.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.08.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.08.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
27.08.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
27.08.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.08.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.08.2024 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.03.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.01.2024 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.01.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.01.2024 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 5
25.01.2024 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 5
25.01.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.01.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
25.01.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.01.2024 Search started Search / examination 1
27.09.2023 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35
20.09.2023 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
03.07.2023 Invitation to pay claims fees Search / examination 2
10.05.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.05.2023 Claims Search / examination 5
10.05.2023 Description Search / examination 18
10.05.2023 Drawings Search / examination 6
10.05.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
24.04.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.04.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
24.04.2023 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 30