EP4277145 - USER EQUIPMENT MOBILITY FOR COMMUNICATION USING REFLECTIVE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLENBECK, Jan Gruenwald / DE | 02 /
MEYER, Stefan Hoechstadt / DE | 03 /
GUNZELMANN, Bertram Koenigsbrunn / DE | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Froud, Christopher Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23171413.0 | 03.05.2023 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | US202263340737P | 11.05.2022 Original published format: US 202263340737 P | US202318186871 | 20.03.2023 Original published format: US202318186871 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277145 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04B7/04013 (EP);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04B7/06952 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILITÄT EINER BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MIT REFLEKTIERENDEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2023/46] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT MOBILITY FOR COMMUNICATION USING REFLECTIVE SURFACES | [2023/46] | French: | MOBILITÉ D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR POUR COMMUNICATION À L'AIDE DE SURFACES RÉFLÉCHISSANTES | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]CN111245492 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014]; figures 1,3 * [A] 1-4,6-15; | [IY] - XUFANG WANG ET AL, "Hybrid 3D Beamforming Relying on Sensor-Based Training and Channel Estimation for Reconfigurable Intelligent Surface Aided TeraHertz MIMO systems", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20220204), XP091148355 [I] 1-4,6-15 * Section II; page 2 - page 3; figure 1 * * Section V, Algorithm 1; page 6 - page 8; figure 2 * [Y] 5 | [A] - CHENHAO QI ET AL, "Acquisition of Channel State Information for mmWave Massive MIMO: Traditional and Machine Learning-based Approaches", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20220312), XP091167479 [A] 1-15 * page 11, line 1 - line 11 * |