EP4223638 - WINGLESS AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spherie GmbH Am Sandtorkai 27-28 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSELBARTH, Jonathan 64283 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
CHIBAC, Nicolas 20359 Hamburg / DE | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2023/32] | Application number, filing date | 23177056.1 | 01.11.2016 | [2023/32] | Priority number, date | DE201510119065 | 06.11.2015 Original published format: DE102015119065 | [2023/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4223638 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64U20/87, B64U10/13, B64U30/20, B64U50/19, B64U101/30, H04N23/90 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
B64U10/13 (EP,CN,US);
B64U20/87 (EP,CN,US);
B64U30/20 (EP,CN,US);
B64U50/19 (EP,CN,US);
G03B15/006 (CN,US);
H04N23/90 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/32] | B64C39/02, B64D47/08, B64U10/13, B64U30/20, B64U50/19, B64U101/30, H04N23/90 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Title | German: | FLÜGELLOSES FLUGGERÄT | [2023/32] | English: | WINGLESS AIRCRAFT | [2023/32] | French: | AÉRONEF SANS AILE | [2023/32] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 07.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16801390.2 / EP3371050 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]GB2385840 (FRIEND LEE SCOTT [GB]); | [A]DE102005020592 (DOLCH STEFAN [DE]); | [A]US2012303179 (SCHEMPF HAGEN [US]); | [A]CN103387051 (CHANGCHUN OPTICS FINE MECH); | [XI]WO2014007873 (WAGREICH DAVID [US]); | [A]EP2728308 (TOPCON CORP [JP]); | [A]EP2772725 (TOPCON CORP [JP]); | [A]CN204264449U (STATE GRID CORP CHINA, et al); | [A]CN104890875 (UNIV TIANJIN); | [A]DE102014103847 (SCHMIDT JOCHEN [DE]) |