EP4292852 - SHIFT PUMP FLOW SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - classification | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cooper-Standard Automotive, Inc. 40300 Traditions Drive Northville, MI 48168 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALONE, David S. Northville, 48168 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23178727.6 | 12.06.2023 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US202263351526P | 13.06.2022 Original published format: US 202263351526 P | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292852 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292852 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/02, F04B23/04 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B60K11/02 (EP);
H05K7/20872 (US);
F01P3/12 (US);
F01P5/12 (US);
F04D1/10 (EP);
F04D13/14 (EP);
F04D15/0016 (EP);
F04D15/0027 (EP);
F04D15/0072 (EP);
F04D29/426 (EP);
F04D29/582 (EP);
F04D29/5833 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | B60K11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTBARES PUMPENFLUSSSCHEMA | [2023/51] | English: | SHIFT PUMP FLOW SCHEME | [2023/51] | French: | SCHÉMA D'ÉCOULEMENT DE POMPES COMMUTABLE | [2023/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3121040 (ALEEES ECO ARK (CAYMAN) CO LTD [KY]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004]; figures 1-3; claim - *; | [A]CN113103847 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claims 11-15 *; | [A]WO2021194406 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |