EP4292627 - SYRINGE PLUNGER WITH DYNAMIC SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard, PO Box 915 Whippany, NJ 07981 / US | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swantner, Michael Saxonburg, Pennsylvania, 16056 / US | 02 /
McDermott, Michael Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, 15237 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23179965.1 | 04.01.2018 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201762443302P | 06.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762443302 P | [2023/51] | Previously filed application, date | WO2018US12284 | 04.01.2018 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292627 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292627 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/31 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61M5/31513 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3129 (CN);
A61M2005/3123 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3131 (CN);
A61M2207/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | A61M5/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | SPRITZENKOLBEN MIT DYNAMISCHER DICHTUNG | [2023/51] | English: | SYRINGE PLUNGER WITH DYNAMIC SEAL | [2023/51] | French: | PISTON DE SERINGUE À JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DYNAMIQUE | [2023/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18701619.1 / EP3565619 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1166807 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 2,13 *; | [A]US6984222 (HITCHINS MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 11 *; | [A]WO2006109272 (COEUR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2010130935 (HIEB MARTIN G [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0033]; figures 4a, 4b *; | [A]WO2010139793 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 3,4, 9 *; | [A]US2016325048 (BERRY JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036]; figures 12-15 * | by applicant | US7666169 | US9173995 | US9199033 | US2016151570 | US9480797 | US9700670 |