blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4246035

EP4246035 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nichia Corporation
491-100, Oka
Kaminaka-cho
Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP
[2023/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Okahisa, Tsuyoshi
Anan-shi, Tokushima, 774-8601 / JP
02 / Yoshida, Norimasa
Anan-shi, Tokushima, 774-8601 / JP
 [2023/38]
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
[2023/38]
Application number, filing date23184954.808.03.2019
[2023/38]
Priority number, dateJP2018004335009.03.2018         Original published format: JP 2018043350
JP2018021473115.11.2018         Original published format: JP 2018214731
[2023/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP4246035
Date:20.09.2023
Language:EN
[2023/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP4246035
Date:08.11.2023
Language:EN
[2023/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:G03B15/02, F21S41/663, G03B15/05, F21S41/143, F21S41/153, F21S41/19, F21S41/20, H01L25/075, H01L33/58, // H01L33/46, H01L33/50
[2023/45]
CPC:
G03B15/02 (EP,US); G03B15/05 (EP,KR,US); G03B15/03 (CN);
H01L33/58 (EP,US); F21S41/143 (EP); F21S41/153 (EP);
F21S41/19 (EP); F21S41/285 (EP); F21S41/663 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (CN); F21V5/045 (CN); H01L25/0753 (EP);
H01L27/156 (US); H01L33/507 (US); G03B2215/0553 (EP);
G03B2215/0567 (EP,KR,US); G03B2215/0571 (KR); G03B2215/0592 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/46 (EP); H01L33/505 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2023/38]F21S41/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2023/38]
TitleGerman:LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG[2023/38]
English:LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE[2023/38]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE LUMINEUSE[2023/38]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP19161516.0  / EP3537213
EP20202847.8  / EP3805859
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2016072996  (RAMMAH MARWAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0031] - [0039]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]JP2016127145  (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) [Y] 11,13 * paragraphs [018 ] , [0041]; figures 2,3,8 *;
 [XY]DE102016101810  (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10,12,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0009] - [0014] , [0057] - [0076]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 11,13
by applicantJP5275557B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.