EP4317635 - PANIC FITTING FOR AN ESCAPE DOOR WITH A HANDLE ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY Sicherheitstechnik GmbH Bildstockstrasse 20 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teufel, Manuel 72479 Straßberg / DE | 02 /
Hennecke, Gerhard 42555 Velbert / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23189125.0 | 02.08.2023 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | DE202210119782 | 05.08.2022 Original published format: DE102022119782 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317635 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05B63/00, E05B65/10, // E05B3/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
E05B65/1066 (EP);
E05B63/0056 (EP);
E05B3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PANIKBESCHLAG FÜR EINE FLUCHTTÜR MIT EINER GRIFFSTANGE | [2024/06] | English: | PANIC FITTING FOR AN ESCAPE DOOR WITH A HANDLE ROD | [2024/06] | French: | FERRURE ANTI-PANIQUE POUR PORTE D'ISSUE DE SECOURS DOTÉE D'UNE TIGE DE PRÉHENSION | [2024/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2553041 (NEWMAN TONKS LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]EP0799957 (DORLA S A [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10132344 (KURT SPITZER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102005037041 (WILKE HEINRICH HEWI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1355024 (CISA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3406829 (BKS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3213668 | EP2439361 |