EP4343140 - WIND APPARATUS TO MAXIMIZE THE AMOUNT OF KINETIC ENERGY ASSOCIATED WITH AN AIR FLOW CAPTURED OVER TIME BY SAID WIND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 20.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consiglio Nazionale delle Ricerche Piazzale Aldo Moro 7 00185 Roma / IT | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LODATO, Carmelo 00185 Roma / IT | 02 /
MARSALA, Giuseppe 00185 Roma / IT | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Ferriero, Paolo, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.a. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 23198712.4 | 21.09.2023 | [2024/13] | Priority number, date | IT20220019611 | 23.09.2022 Original published format: IT202200019611 | [2024/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4343140 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F03D5/00, F03D5/06 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
F03D5/06 (EP);
F03D15/00 (US);
F03D9/25 (US);
H02K7/183 (US);
F05B2260/40 (US);
F05B2270/1033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDVORRICHTUNG, UM DIE MENGE AN KINETISCHER ENERGIE ZU MAXIMIEREN, DIE MIT EINEM LUFTSTROM VERBUNDEN IST, DER IM LAUFE DER ZEIT VON DER WINDVORRICHTUNG ERFASST WIRD | [2024/13] | English: | WIND APPARATUS TO MAXIMIZE THE AMOUNT OF KINETIC ENERGY ASSOCIATED WITH AN AIR FLOW CAPTURED OVER TIME BY SAID WIND APPARATUS | [2024/13] | French: | APPAREIL ÉOLIEN POUR MAXIMISER LA QUANTITÉ D'ÉNERGIE CINÉTIQUE ASSOCIÉE À UN FLUX D'AIR CAPTURÉ AU FIL DU TEMPS PAR LEDIT APPAREIL ÉOLIEN | [2024/13] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/41] | 29.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010150032 (KOKAI DENES [HU]); | [A]US2014367973 (SAAVEDRA JOHN A [US]); | [A]US2020056589 (EVANS SCOTT CHARLES [US], et al) |