EP4316592 - CARBAMOYL PHENYLALANINOL COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | 29.03.2024 | Change - classification | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axsome Malta Ltd. Pinto Business Centre, Level 4, Office 4 Mill Street Qormi QRM 3104 / MT | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HURLEY, Fionn Dublin / IE | 02 /
CARTER, Lawrence Patrick Palo Alto, 94304 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 23199791.7 | 06.10.2017 | [2024/06] | Priority number, date | US201662404917P | 06.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662404917 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4316592 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4316592 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/66, A61K31/325, A61P25/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
C07C271/66 (EP,US);
C07C275/60 (KR);
A61K31/17 (KR);
A61K31/325 (KR);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP,KR);
A61P25/24 (EP,KR);
A61P25/28 (EP,KR);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/06] | A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | CARBAMOYLPHENYLALANINOLVERBINDUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2024/06] | English: | CARBAMOYL PHENYLALANINOL COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2024/06] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE CARBAMOYL PHÉNYLALANINOL ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2024/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17790906.6 / EP3523275 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US5705640 | US5756817 | US5955499 | US6140532 | US6680299 | US6680324 | US6680322 | US2012004300 | US8232315 | US8440715 | US8552060 | US8623913 | US8729120 | US8741950 | US8895609 | US8927602 | US2015018414 | US8952062 | US9050302 | US9226910 | US9359290 | - T. HIGUCHIV. STELLA, Prodrugs as Novel delivery Systems, vol. 14 |