EP4398459 - AN ELECTRICAL MOTOR STATOR AND COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohler, Stephan 77815 Buehl / DE | 02 /
WAN, Zhengmao Changsha, Hunan, 410100 / CN | 03 /
Ritt, Jean-Marc 77815 Buehl / DE | 04 /
CHENG, Fan Changsha, Hunan, 410100 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Yilin Changsha, Hunan, 410100 / CN | 06 /
He, Guofu Changsha, Hunan, 410100 / CN | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 23213215.9 | 30.11.2023 | [2024/28] | Priority number, date | CN202211654656 | 22.12.2022 Original published format: CN202211654656 | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4398459 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/52, H02K5/22, // H02K5/10, H02K11/33 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H02K3/522 (EP,US);
F04B35/04 (CN);
F25B31/026 (US);
H02K3/38 (CN);
H02K3/50 (CN);
H02K5/225 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATOR UND VERDICHTER FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMOTOR | [2024/28] | English: | AN ELECTRICAL MOTOR STATOR AND COMPRESSOR | [2024/28] | French: | STATOR ET COMPRESSEUR DE MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2024/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7135793 (SEGUCHI MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2007069841 (KUSANO HIDEKI [JP]); | [A]US8143752 (ALTINDIS ISMAIL [DE]); | [I]JP2015116032 (LWJ KK); | [A]US2017201145 (ROOKS ERIC [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2019053002 (MMT AG [CH]); | [A]CN111052544 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [I]US11152835 (KATO SHUN [JP], et al); | [A]EP3989407 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) |