blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news
blank News flashes
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4511249

EP4511249 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RAIL BRAKE, ELECTROMAGNETIC RAIL BRAKE AND RAIL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.01.2025
Database last updated on 13.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2025Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Knorr-Bremse Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Beethovengasse 43-45
2340 Mödling / AT
[2025/09]
Inventor(s)01 / JÖRGL, Volker
2384 Breitenfurt / AT
02 / TIPPELT, Daniel
2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT
03 / KASSAN, Michael
2751 Steinabrückl / AT
04 / HRUBY, Alexandr
2340 Mödling / AT
05 / LOEBNER, Reinhard
81829 München / DE
06 / WERMUND, Ulrich
80804 München / DE
07 / GALANDER, Jens
85221 Dachau / DE
 [2025/09]
Representative(s)Aurigium Leischner & Luthe
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Robert-Koch-Straße 2
82152 Planegg / DE
[2025/09]
Application number, filing date23719391.717.04.2023
[2025/09]
WO2023EP59865
Priority number, dateDE20221010946219.04.2022         Original published format: DE102022109462
[2025/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2023202962
Date:26.10.2023
Language:DE
[2023/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4511249
Date:26.02.2025
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2025/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.10.2023
ClassificationIPC:B60L7/28, B61H7/08, B60T13/58, B60T13/10, B60T13/14, B61H7/04, B60T13/66, B60T17/22, F16D63/00
[2025/09]
CPC:
B60T17/228 (EP,US); B60T13/748 (EP,US); B60T13/148 (EP);
B60T13/588 (EP); B60T13/665 (EP); B60T13/743 (US); (+)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   ME,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2025/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER MAGNETSCHIENENBREMSE, MAGNETSCHIENENBREMSE UND SCHIENENFAHRZEUG[2025/09]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RAIL BRAKE, ELECTROMAGNETIC RAIL BRAKE AND RAIL VEHICLE[2025/09]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN FREIN ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE SUR RAIL, FREIN ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE SUR RAIL ET VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE[2025/09]
Entry into regional phase14.10.2024National basic fee paid 
14.10.2024Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.2024Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.10.2024Examination requested  [2025/09]
14.10.2024Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2025Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2025Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2060331  (KNORR BREMSE GMBH);
 [A]DE10009331  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]);
 [A]DE102011110050  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.