EP4353682 - SUPERFICIALLY POROUS MATERIALS COMPRISING A SUBSTANTIALLY NONPOROUS HYBRID CORE HAVING NARROW PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION; PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF; AND USE THEREOF FOR CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waters Technologies Corporation 34 Maple Street Milford, MA 01757 / US | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYNDHAM, Kevin D. Upton, 01568 / US | 02 /
MURIITHI, Beatrice W. Franklin, 02038 / US | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 24160497.4 | 25.07.2011 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | US201036779710P | 26.07.2010 Original published format: US 36779710 P | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4353682 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4353682 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/286, B01J20/32, B01J20/28, C01B33/26 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B01J20/28071 (EP);
B01J20/283 (US);
B01J20/28004 (EP);
B01J20/28057 (EP);
B01J20/285 (US);
B01J20/286 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP,US);
B01J20/3219 (EP);
B01J20/3236 (EP);
B01J20/3257 (EP);
B01J20/3289 (EP);
B01J20/3293 (EP);
Y10T428/2991 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/16] | C01B33/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | MATERIALIEN MIT PORÖSER OBERFLÄCHE UND EINEM SUBSTANTIELL NICHT-PORÖSEN HYBRIDKERN MIT ENGER PARTIKELGRÖSSENVERTEILUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON FÜR CHROMATOGRAPHISCHE TRENNUNGEN | [2024/16] | English: | SUPERFICIALLY POROUS MATERIALS COMPRISING A SUBSTANTIALLY NONPOROUS HYBRID CORE HAVING NARROW PARTICLE SIZE DISTRIBUTION; PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF; AND USE THEREOF FOR CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATIONS | [2024/16] | French: | MATÉRIAUX POREUX EN SURFACE COMPRENANT UN NOYAU HYBRIDE SENSIBLEMENT NON POREUX ET PRÉSENTANT UNE DISTRIBUTION ÉTROITE DE TAILLE DES PARTICULES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DESDITS MATÉRIAUX ET UTILISATION DESDITS MATÉRIAUX POUR DES SÉPARATIONS CHROMATOGRAPHIQUES | [2024/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11815053.1 / EP2598440 | EP20209731.7 / EP3834928 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3505785 (KIRKLAND JOSEPH J); | [AD]WO2008103423 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD [US], et al); | [A]US2009297853 (KIRKLAND JOSEPH J [US], et al); | [ADP]WO2010141426 (WATERS TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | US4017528 | EP0084979 | US4911903 | US4983369 | US5374755 | US6528167 | US6686035 | US7101520 | WO2006106493 | US7175913 | US7223473 | US7250214 | US2007189944 | WO2008103423 | US2008269368 | US2008277346 | EP2181069 | WO2010061367 | WO2010141426 | WO2011017418 | US7919177 |