|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1987 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.05.1987 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1987 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.04.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Communication of the Legal Board of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.03.1987 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.03.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1986 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1986 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
09.10.1985 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.10.1985 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.09.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.1985 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.1985 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.04.1985 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.1985 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1984 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.05.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.09.1983 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1982 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
16.07.1982 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.1982 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.07.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
15.06.1982 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.1982 |
Communication about possibility to obtain an European search report after lack of unity of the international application |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
27.05.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1982 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1981 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1981 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.1981 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1981 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.02.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.1980 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1980 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1980 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.1980 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.1980 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1980 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.06.1979 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1979 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1979 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1979 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1978 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1978 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1978 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
23.10.1978 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |