EP0003590 - Apparatus for butt welding lollow metallic objects using an arc which is moved magnetically along its closed path [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/19] | Apparatus for welding hollow metallic objects using a magnetically moved arc | ||
[1983/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1984 [1984/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Schweissanlagen & Roboter GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 140 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1983/10] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states INDUSTRIE-WERKE KARLSRUHE AUGSBURG Aktiengesellschaft Zweigniederlassung Keller & Knappich Zugspitzstrasse 140 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states Industrie-Werke Karlsruhe Augsburg Aktiengesellschaft Gartenstrasse 71 D-76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altstetter, Manfred Amselweg 12 D-8901 Wulfertshausen / DE | 02 /
Pache, Norbert Zusmarshauser Weg 7a D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Mazac, Karel, Dipl.-Ing. Nebelhornstrasse 2 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/24] | Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Schwibbogenplatz 2b D-86153 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1980/03] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1980/03] | Zahn, Roland, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gartenstrasse 71 D-7500 Karlsruhe 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 79100343.7 | 06.02.1979 | Priority number, date | DE19782805562 | 10.02.1978 Original published format: DE 2805562 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0003590 | Date: | 22.08.1979 | Language: | DE | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0003590 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1979 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/08 | [1983/19] | CPC: |
B23K9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schweissen metallischer Hohlkörper mit einem längs der in sich geschlossenen Schweisskantennahtbahn magnetisch bewegten Lichtbogen | [1983/19] | English: | Apparatus for butt welding lollow metallic objects using an arc which is moved magnetically along its closed path | [1983/19] | French: | Dispositif pour le soudage d'objets métalliques creux avec un arc entraîné magnétiquement le long de la soudure continue | [1983/19] |
Former [1983/19] | Vorrichtung zum Schweissen metallischer Hohlkörper mit magnetisch bewegtem Lichtbogen | ||
Former [1983/19] | Apparatus for welding hollow metallic objects using a magnetically moved arc | ||
Former [1983/19] | Dispositif pour le soudage d'objets métalliques creux avec un arc entraîné magnétiquement | Examination procedure | 12.02.1980 | Examination requested [1980/09] | 24.09.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 10.02.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 11.05.1983 | NL | 11.05.1983 | [1983/51] |
Former [1983/50] | NL | 11.05.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | US3882299 [ ] (SCIAKY DAVID); | DE2258417 [ ] (KELLER & KNAPPICH AUGSBURG); | DE1253839 [ ] (FOSTER WHEELER LTD); | DE2015570 [ ] | Examination | DD102323 | DE1841989U |