EP0005857 - Method for transferring ultrasonic energy to or from an object and focused ultrasonic transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/41] | Focused ultrasonic transducer | ||
[1981/41] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.04.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC RESEARCH CORPORATION 2224 South Priest Drive Tempe Arizone 85282 / US | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopel, LeRoy 1524 East Edgewater Drive Tempe Arizona 85283 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair, Schumann, Jakob, Bezold Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101747.8 | 01.06.1979 | Priority number, date | US19780911524 | 01.06.1978 Original published format: US 911524 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0005857 | Date: | 12.12.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0005857 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0005857 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/02, G10K11/26, H04R1/34 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
G10K11/02 (EP,US);
G10K11/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/41] | G10K11/02, G10K11/06, H04R1/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung von Ultraschallenergie in oder aus einem Körper und fakussierender Ultraschallwandler | [1981/41] | English: | Method for transferring ultrasonic energy to or from an object and focused ultrasonic transducer | [1981/41] | French: | Procédé pour la transmission de l'énergie ultra-sonore vers ou d'un object et transducteur ultra-sonore focalisé | [1981/41] |
Former [1981/41] | Fokalisierter Ultraschallwandler | ||
Former [1981/41] | Focused ultrasonic transducer | ||
Former [1981/41] | Transducteur ultrasonore focalisé | Examination procedure | 04.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/18] | 08.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.04.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1982
12.07.1982
ADMISSIBLE Kretztechnik Gesellschaft m.b.H., Frankenburg Tiefenbach 20 A-4871 Zipf / AT Opponent's representative Hübscher, Gerhard, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1982
12.07.1982
ADMISSIBLE Kretztechnik Gesellschaft m.b.H., Frankenburg Tiefenbach 20 A-4871 Zipf / AT Opponent's representative Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | 01.07.1982 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.07.1982 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.09.1982 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.03.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.01.1988 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 09.08.1985 | Appeal received No. T0207/85 | 16.07.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.1987 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.10.1981 | GB | 01.06.1988 | [1989/32] |
Former [1989/23] | NL | 14.10.1981 | |
Former [1982/45] | NL | 14.10.1981 | Documents cited: | Search | FR900298 [ ] (G E M A GES FU R ELEKTROAKUSTI); | US3529465 [ ] (KLEESATTEL CLAUS, et al); | DE2537788 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | US4016530 [ ] (GOLL JEFFREY H) |