EP0012944 - Colour-fast monoazo pigment mixtures stable against recrystallisation, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1980/14] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 80 03 20 D-65926 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehl, Klaus, Dr. Geisenheimer Strasse 92 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 71 / DE | 02 /
Deubel, Reinhold, Dr. Geierfeld 51 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [1980/14] | Application number, filing date | 79105140.2 | 13.12.1979 | [1980/14] | Priority number, date | DE19782854974 | 20.12.1978 Original published format: DE 2854974 | [1980/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0012944 | Date: | 09.07.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0012944 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09B69/04, C09B29/33 | [1980/14] | CPC: |
C09B67/0051 (EP,US);
C09B29/33 (EP,US);
C09B69/045 (EP,US);
Y10S534/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/14] | Title | German: | Rekristallisationsstabile farbstarke Monoazopigmentgemische, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1980/14] | English: | Colour-fast monoazo pigment mixtures stable against recrystallisation, process for their preparation and their use | [1980/14] | French: | Mélanges de pigments monoazoiques, ne déteignant et ne recristallisant pas, procédé pour leur préparation et leur application | [1980/14] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/07] | 14.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP7011026B [ ]; | JPH112670B [ ] | [ ] - DERWENT JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, 1970, Band R, Nr. 17, Seite 4, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, WC1X8RP, GB & JP - B - 70 11026 (TOYO INK) * Zusammenfassung *, & JP7011026B B 00000000 | Examination | FR2285443 | FR2183965 | DE2135468 | FR2213966 | FR2084545 |