|
26.07.1987 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.1987 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.01.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1986 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.11.1986 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.1986 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1985 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.11.1985 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.11.1985 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
20.09.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1985 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.03.1985 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.1985 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1984 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1984 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1984 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1984 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1984 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1984 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.1984 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1984 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.06.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.01.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.12.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1983 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1983 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.05.1983 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.06.1982 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1982 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.1981 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1981 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.1981 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1980 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1979 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1979 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.1979 |
Request for re-establishment of rights allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.07.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |