|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.09.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
21.08.1995 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1986 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.04.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1985 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.09.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1985 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.1985 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
24.08.1985 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
24.08.1985 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.08.1985 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.06.1985 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1985 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1985 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1985 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.01.1985 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1984 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.12.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.03.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
18.11.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1982 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1982 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1982 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.08.1982 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1981 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.1981 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1980 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1979 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |