|
11.02.1992 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.11.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.08.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
94 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.06.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.12.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.06.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.04.1990 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.1990 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.1988 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1988 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1988 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1988 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1988 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.02.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.1988 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.10.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1987 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.06.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.05.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
12.05.1987 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1987 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1987 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1986 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.06.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.10.1984 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.04.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1984 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
150 |
|
16.12.1983 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1981 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1980 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
107 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
142 |
|
05.11.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |