|
04.02.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.10.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.10.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.10.1991 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.10.1991 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.10.1991 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.11.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.1990 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1990 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1990 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1989 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.03.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
31.07.1987 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1987 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1986 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.12.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1985 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1985 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1985 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1985 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
15.07.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.03.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1984 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1984 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1984 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.08.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1984 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1984 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.02.1984 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.12.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1983 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.08.1983 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1983 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1983 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.1983 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.1983 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.07.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1983 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.1983 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.05.1983 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1983 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
01.05.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1983 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.03.1982 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.1981 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.11.1981 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1981 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.1981 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.1981 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1981 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1981 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.1981 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.04.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.04.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1980 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.09.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.1979 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
31.08.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1979 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |