|
18.05.1988 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1988 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1988 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1988 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1988 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1987 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1987 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.02.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1986 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1985 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1985 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.1985 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.10.1985 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.1985 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1985 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1985 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1985 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.03.1985 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.12.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.11.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.11.1984 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.11.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.06.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1984 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1984 |
Communication of written evidence |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1984 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1984 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.05.1983 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
10.03.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.12.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.10.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
24.08.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.1981 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1980 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.03.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1980 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.1979 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |