|
27.04.1988 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1988 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1988 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1988 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1987 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.11.1987 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.11.1987 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.10.1987 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.10.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.1987 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.1987 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1986 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.07.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.05.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1986 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1985 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.10.1985 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.1985 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1985 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.1985 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.1985 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1985 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.08.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.1985 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1985 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1985 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.04.1985 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.1985 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.04.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.04.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.04.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1985 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.03.1985 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1985 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1985 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1985 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1984 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1984 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.08.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.07.1984 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.01.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.1984 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.01.1984 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.10.1983 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1983 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1983 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1983 |
Communication of notices of intervention |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1983 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1983 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1983 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1983 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.04.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.04.1983 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1983 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1983 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1983 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.04.1983 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.04.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.04.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.04.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.04.1983 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.08.1982 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1982 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.1982 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.01.1982 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.1982 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1981 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1981 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.10.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1980 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1979 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1979 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.07.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |