EP0011630 - A SELF-PROPELLED IRRIGATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRONLYKKE, Sven Logismose Gods DK-5683 Harby, Funen / DK | [1980/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1980/12] | Representative(s) | Lavoix, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place D'Estienne D'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1980/12] | Application number, filing date | 79900333.0 | 21.03.1979 | [1980/12] | WO1979DK00010 | Priority number, date | DK19780001321 | 22.03.1978 Original published format: DK 132178 | DK19780002509 | 06.06.1978 Original published format: DK 250978 | [1980/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900810 | Date: | 18.10.1979 | [1979/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0011630 | Date: | 11.06.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0011630 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/02] | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/09, B65H75/00 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
A01G25/095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/12] | A01G25/09 | Designated contracting states | FR [1980/12] | Title | German: | EINE SELBSTFAHR-BEWÄSSERUNGSANLAGE | [1980/12] | English: | A SELF-PROPELLED IRRIGATOR | [1980/12] | French: | ARROSEUR AUTO-PROPULSE | [1980/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.1979 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1979 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1980 | Examination requested [1980/14] | 13.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1981 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE215616 ; | [A]DE294358 ; | [X]US1507506 (EDWARD MURPHY ALBERT); | [A]DK132734B (JANSEN D J) |