EP0020482 - APPARATUS FOR APPLYING CHEMICALS TO WEEDS AND PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/01] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING CHEMICALS TO WEEDS AND PLANTS | ||
[1984/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARDY, James H. P.O. Box 259 Rt. 2, Batesville, MS 38606 / US | For all designated states ROBERSON, James E. 220 Bates Street Batesville, MS 38606 / US | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 79901312.3 | 26.09.1979 | [1981/01] | WO1979US00786 | Priority number, date | US19780945875 | 26.09.1978 Original published format: US 945875 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8000666 | Date: | 17.04.1980 | [1980/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020482 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020482 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/00, A01M21/04 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
A01M21/043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1981/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG VON CHEMIKALIEN BEI UNKRAUT UND PFLANZEN | [1984/09] | English: | APPARATUS FOR APPLYING CHEMICALS TO WEEDS AND PLANTS | [1984/09] | French: | APPAREILLAGE POUR L'APPLICATION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES A DES MAUVAISES HERBES ET A DES PLANTES | [1984/09] |
Former [1981/01] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG VON CHEMIKALIEN BEI UNKRAUT UND PFLANZEN | ||
Former [1981/01] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR APPLYING CHEMICALS TO WEEDS AND PLANTS | ||
Former [1981/01] | PROCEDE ET APPAREILLAGE POUR L'APPLICATION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES A DES MAUVAISES HERBES ET A DES PLANTES | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1980 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.1980 | Search fee paid | 06.06.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 13.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.02.1984 | FR | 29.02.1984 | NL | 29.02.1984 | LU | 30.09.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 29.02.1984 | |
NL | 29.02.1984 | ||
LU | 30.09.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | CH | 29.02.1984 | |
NL | 29.02.1984 | ||
Former [1984/30] | CH | 29.02.1984 | Cited in | International search | [A]US910933 (MAHANAY ANDREW J [US]); | [A]US1507595 (GOODE WILLIAM W); | [A]US1527669 (THOMAS CAMP); | [A]US1764952 (HAY CLARENCE B); | [A]US2123988 (CORLEY ALEX M); | [A]US2311782 (SEGARS EDWARD H); | [A]US2769668 (RICHARDS LORENZO A); | [A]US3021642 (EWING BERNARD E); | [A]US3320694 (BIRON RAPHAEL A); | [A]US3651600 (EWING BERNARD E); | [A]US4019278 (MCKIRDY JAMES A) | Examination | US3021641 |