EP0016450 - Synthetic fur and process for preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minemura, Norihiro 9-16, Sanban-cho Hiyoshidai Takatsuki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Toyao, Manabu 9-124, Minohara 3-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Tsukasa 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | 04 /
Tashiro, Mikio 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 80101382.2 | 17.03.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | JP19790034216 | 26.03.1979 Original published format: JP 3421679 | JP19790104936 | 20.08.1979 Original published format: JP 10493679 | JP19790122528 | 26.09.1979 Original published format: JP 12252879 | JP19790131782 | 15.10.1979 Original published format: JP 13178279 | JP19800006291 | 24.01.1980 Original published format: JP 629180 | JP19800007715 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: JP 771580 | JP19800011430 | 04.02.1980 Original published format: JP 1143080 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016450 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016450 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A41D5/00, D06C29/00, // D01D5/253, D01D5/24 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
A41D5/003 (EP,US);
D01D5/24 (EP,US);
D01D5/253 (EP,US);
D04B1/025 (EP,US);
D10B2501/044 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23929 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23936 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2925 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1980/20] | Title | German: | Synthetischer Pelz und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1980/20] | English: | Synthetic fur and process for preparation thereof | [1980/20] | French: | Fourrure synthétique et procédé pour sa préparation | [1980/20] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 23.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | NL265429 [ ]; | CH318169 [ ] (RHODIACETA [FR]); | FR1441100 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | US3493459 [ ] (MCINTOSH EUELL K, et al); | FR2244846 [ ] (DU PONT [US]) |