|
28.04.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.1988 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.10.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
25.08.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
11.06.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.04.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1987 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1987 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.12.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1986 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.10.1986 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1986 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1986 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1986 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.11.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.1985 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.1985 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1985 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.07.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1984 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.06.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1984 |
Communication: The notice of opposition is deemed not to have been filed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1984 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1984 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1984 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.03.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.03.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.1984 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.02.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.05.1983 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1982 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
22.10.1982 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.1982 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.07.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1982 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1982 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1982 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.1982 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.03.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.02.1982 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.04.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1981 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1981 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1981 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.08.1980 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |