|
25.03.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.01.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.01.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1990 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.09.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1988 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
07.05.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.11.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.1987 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1987 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.02.1987 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.10.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1986 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1986 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1986 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1986 |
Description |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.04.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1986 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1985 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.04.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.03.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.11.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1984 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.01.1984 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1983 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1983 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.1983 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.1983 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1983 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
16.05.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.1983 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.1982 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1982 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1982 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1982 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1982 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1982 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1982 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1982 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.05.1982 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.03.1982 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1982 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.1982 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1982 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1981 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1980 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1980 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.1980 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.1980 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.08.1980 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |