EP0029942 - Universal blending silo and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peschl, Ivan A.S.Z. Kennedylaan 8 NL-6029 RE Sterksel / NL | [1981/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/23] | Representative(s) | Staeger, Sigurd, et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. H. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. H. Bohr, Dipl.-Ing. S. Staeger Müllerstrasse 31 D-8000 München 5 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Staeger, Sigurd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. H. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. H. Bohr, Dipl.-Ing. S. Staeger Müllerstrasse 31 D-8000 München 5 / DE | ||
Former [1981/23] | Staeger, Sigurd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dr.-Ing. H. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. H. Bohr, Dipl.-Ing. S. Staeger Müllerstrasse 31 D-8000 München 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80106986.5 | 12.11.1980 | [1981/23] | Priority number, date | US19790099038 | 30.11.1979 Original published format: US 99038 | [1981/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029942 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029942 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01F25/16, B65G65/30 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
B01F25/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/23] | Title | German: | Universal-Mischsilo und Verfahren | [1981/23] | English: | Universal blending silo and method | [1981/23] | French: | Procédé et silo mélangeur universel | [1981/23] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 23.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE457041 [ ] (MASCHB ANSTALT HUMBOLDT); | US2805802 [ ] (STRONG ALLEN K); | GB842477 [ ] (ANDERS SIGVARD JONSSON); | DE1889382U [ ] (SCHUECHTERMANN & KREMER [DE]); | DE1277143 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | AT319852B [ ] (LUDWIG HUNKEL [DE]) |