|
26.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1988 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1988 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1988 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.10.1988 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1988 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.12.1986 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1986 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1986 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.10.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.1986 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.08.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1986 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1986 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.1986 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1986 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.04.1986 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.03.1986 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Description |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.09.1985 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1985 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1985 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.03.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1984 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1984 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1984 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1984 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1984 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.1984 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied within the opposition period |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.1983 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1983 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1983 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1983 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1983 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.1982 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.1982 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
01.10.1982 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1981 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1981 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1980 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1980 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.06.1980 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |